Onstad v. Hobbs et al

Defendant: Raymond Naylor, Dexter Payne, Todd Ball, Danny Burl, Larry Mays, Ray Hobbs and John Does
Plaintiff: Alan Cole Onstad
Case Number: 2:2013cv00080
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 131 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's 69 motion for summary judgment and 105 motion to compel are denied. Defendants' 99 motion for partial summary judgment and 116 122 motions for summary judgment are granted. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/27/2014. (ks)
May 27, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 133 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court further certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/27/2014. (ks)
July 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and TRO is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/8/13. (vjt)
December 30, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 37 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings; denying 33 plaintiff's motion to certify this case as a class action; and denying 34 plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/30/2013. (ks)
January 23, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The plaintiff will pay the filing and docketing fees through monthly payments from his prison trust account. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order to the warden of the East AR Reg. Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/23/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onstad v. Hobbs et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mays
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Cole Onstad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]