USA v. Hurt et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Bobby L Hurt and Sue R Hurt
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00031
Filed: March 13, 2009
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Accommodations Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/18/2010. (jct)
August 18, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. The video deposition of Amber Brown may be shown to the jury. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/18/2010. (jct)
September 9, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing the following people to bring electronic devices into the Craighead County Courthouse Annex for the trial of this matter between 10/5/10 & 10/8/10, subject to the stated rules: Nicole De Sario, Sean Keveney, Stacey McCord, Tim Brickell or his representative (John Kost or Jackie Prim), Lauyren Frogale, Joy Larry, Tony L. Wilcox, Scott J. Lancaster, Jeff O. Scriber, Bobby L. Hurt, Sue R. Hurt & Raney E. Coleman. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/9/2010. (jct)
October 5, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, regarding Defendants' motions in limine: granting 83 Motion in Limine; granting 85 Motion in Limine; denying 87 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 89 Motion in Limine; granting 91 Motion in Limine; granting 93 Motion in Limine; denying 95 Motion in Limine; granting 97 Motion in Limine; granting 99 Motion in Limine as to the third statement but denying as to the first & second statements; denying 101 Motion in Limine; granting 103 Motion in Limine; deny ing 105 Motion in Limine; granting 107 Motion in Limine; granting in part & denying in part 109 Motion in Limine; denying 111 Motion in Limine advising Defendants may renew their objection at trial. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/5/2010. (jct)
October 5, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing the following named individuals to bring electronic devices into the U.S. Courthouse in Jonesboro per restrictions indicated between 11/16/10 through 11/19/10: Nicole De Sario, Sean Keveney, Stacey McCord, Tim Brickell or his representative (John Kost or Jackie Prim), Lauyren Frogale, Joy Larry, Tony L. Wilcox, Scott J. Lancaster, Jeff O. Scriber, Bobby L. Hurt, Sue R. Huart & Raney E. Coleman. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/5/2010. (jct)
October 6, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part, as stated, 78 , 79 & 80 Plaintiff's Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/6/2010. (jct) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2010: ) # 1 Main Document - Correct, and the docket entry was modified to correct the signature date and the file date.) (thd)
October 18, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 73 Objections filed by Sue R Hurt, Bobby L Hurt to 61 Plaintiff's designated portions of Defendant Bobby L. Hurt's deposition testimony, overruling or sustaining as indicated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/18/2010. (jct)
October 18, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 72 Objections filed by Sue R Hurt, Bobby L Hurt to 61 Plaintiff's designated portions of Defendant Sue R. Hurt's deposition testimony, overruling or sustaining as indicated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/18/2010. (jct)
October 18, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 Notice filed by Sue R Hurt, Bobby L Hurt to counterdesignate certain portions of Defendant Bobby L. Hurt's deposition testimony to be used at trial & 69 Objections filed by USA, sustaining all of the government's objections. Bobby Hurt is prohibited from designating any of his deposition testimony for use at trial. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/18/2010. (jct)
October 18, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 66 Notice filed by Sue R Hurt, Bobby L Hurt to designate certain portions of Defendant Sue R. Hurt's deposition testimony to be used at trial & 71 Objections filed by USA, sustaining the government's objections. As stated in the Order issued 8/18/10, Sue Hurt has not established her unavailability under Rule 32 & may not designate her deposition testimony for use at trial. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/18/2010. (jct)
October 27, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Robin Dull to bring electronic devices into the U.S. Courthouse in Jonesboro per restrictions indicated between 11/16/10 through 11/19/10. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/27/2010. (jct)
August 13, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding this cause of action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/13/09. (jct)
November 12, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 164 Objections filed by Sue R Hurt & Bobby L Hurt, 169 Objections filed by USA, regarding 161 Plaintiffs' Notice of designated portions of Angela Way's videotaped deposition testimony to be used at trial, overruling or sustaining the objections as reflected. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/12/2010. (jct)
November 29, 2010 197 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Bobby L Hurt & Sue R Hurt pursuant to 196 Jury Verdict. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/29/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. Hurt et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby L Hurt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue R Hurt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]