Butler v. Crittenden County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Tabby Butler
Defendant: Crittenden County, Arkansas, R E Busby, W A Wren and Rodney Strong
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00161
Filed: July 22, 2010
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time. Discovery deadline is extended to & including 7/21/2011; Motions deadline extended to & including 8/4/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/6/2011. (jct)
December 30, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions., (Motions deadline is extended up to & including 1/5/2012.) Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/30/2011. (jct)
January 10, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions. (Dispositive Motions deadline is extended up to & including 1/9/2012.) Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/2012. (jct)
January 17, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial. The 2/27/12 trial date is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/17/2012. (jct)
January 25, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response deadline is extended up to & including 2/2/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/25/2012. (jct)
March 29, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 20 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Butler's federal claims are dismissed with prejudice. Her state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/2012. (jct)
March 29, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 42 Opinion and Order entered this date, in favor of the Defendants on the claims of Tabby Butler. Tabby Butler's federal claims are dismissed with prejudice. Her state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/2012. (jct)
February 28, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Joint MOTION to Continue. The 5/2/11 trial is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Butler v. Crittenden County, Arkansas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabby Butler
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County, Arkansas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R E Busby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W A Wren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Strong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]