Grogan et al v. Nobel Biocare USA LLC et al

Plaintiff: Patsy Grogan and Bill Grogan
Defendant: Nobel Biocare USA LLC, Nobel Biocare USA Inc and John Does
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00043
Filed: March 7, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to 106 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear his/her own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 09/07/2012. (jak)
July 20, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential, commercial & proprietary documents in this action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/20/2011. (jct)
August 30, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Patsy Grogan, Bill Grogan, Brandon Lacy, Tony Wilcox, Dustin Jones, G. Spence Fricke, Michael L.Wright, Jill M. Leversen and Janis M. Kovalscik to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assisstant into the United States Federal Courthouse in Jonesboro beginning 9/10/12, and each day thereafter until the trial is completed subject to the stated rules. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 08/30/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grogan et al v. Nobel Biocare USA LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Grogan
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Grogan
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nobel Biocare USA LLC
Represented By: G. Spence Fricke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nobel Biocare USA Inc
Represented By: G. Spence Fricke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]