Blevens et al v. Barry-Wehmiller Companies Inc et al

Plaintiff: Linda Blevens and Kris E Blevens
Defendant: Barry-Wehmiller Companies Inc and Hayssen Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00126
Filed: July 6, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 105 Featured Case OPININON AND ORDER granting 79 Custom Pak's Motion to Dismiss counterclaim. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/27/2013. (jak)
June 27, 2013 161 Featured Case ORDER removing this case from the trial docket for the week of July 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/27/2013. (jak)
July 8, 2013 163 Featured Case ORDER dismissing all claims in this action with prejudice pursuant to 162 Joint Stipulation for dismissal. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs and the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/08/2013. (jak)
October 31, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Vacating Proposed Final Scheduling Order. The proposed Final Scheduling Order is hereby vacated until such time as the new Defendants shall obtain counsel & file their Answers to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/31/2011. (jct)
February 23, 2012 49 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion to Intervene by Custom-Pak Inc. Intervenor is directed to file its Complaint in Intervention w/i 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/23/2012. (jct)
April 3, 2012 60 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER, by agreement of the parties, Plaintiff is hereby granted up to & including 4/15/2012 in which to respond to separate Defendant Hayco Liquidation Company's (formerly Hayssen Manufacturing Company) Interrogatories & Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/3/2012. (jct)
April 5, 2012 62 Featured Case ORDER, pursuant to 38 Answer, directing the Clerk to correct the name of Defendant as Hayco Liquidation Company, f/k/a Hayssen Manufacturing Company. The Defendant, Hayco Liquidating Company, Inc., should be terminated. Separate Defendant Bemis Company, Inc. is properly identified. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/5/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blevens et al v. Barry-Wehmiller Companies Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Blevens
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: P. Mark Ledbetter
Represented By: Corey B. Trotz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris E Blevens
Represented By: P. Mark Ledbetter
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: Corey B. Trotz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry-Wehmiller Companies Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayssen Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]