Jones et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

Counter_claimant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Counter_defendant: Jere T Jones and Teri Jones
Plaintiff: Jere T Jones and Teri Jones
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00172
Filed: August 25, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/12/2011. (jct)
December 22, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER denying 13 Defendant's Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/22/2011. (jct)
March 14, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs are directed to file their response to 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by 5:00 p.m., March 16, 2012. The Defendant may file a reply by 5:00 p.m., March 23, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/14/2012. (jct)
May 11, 2012 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION that a national bank chartered by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency is authorized to do business within Arkansas. Therefore, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. was authorized to avail itself of the Arkansas Statutory Foreclosure Act. The Court will issue an appropriate Order in each of the five cases. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2012. (jct)
May 11, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER, pursuant to 37 Memorandum Opinion entered this date, granting 17 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. If the Joneses wish to file an amended compla int, they should file a motion for leave to amend w/i 30 days from the entry of this Order. If a motion for leave to amend is not filed, the Court will assume that the Joneses have decided to stand on their pleadings & will enter final Judgment dismissing the Complaint with prejudice, so that an appeal may be taken. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2012. (jct)
June 18, 2012 39 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, pursuant to 37 Memorandum Opinion entered on 5/11/2012. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/18/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jones et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jere T Jones
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Teri Jones
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jere T Jones
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Jones
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]