JPMorgan Chase Bank NA v. Johnson et al

Appellee: Tammy Renae Peeks, Tracy Lea Estes, Daniel L Johnson and Susan D Johnson
Trustee: Mark T McCarty
Appellant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00249
Filed: November 17, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part & denying in part 10 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Cases 3:11-cv-249-BRW, 3:11-cv-250-BRW & 3:11-cv-251-BRW are consolidated with 3:11-cv-249-BRW designated as the Lead Case. The consolidation with case numbers 3:11-cv-172 & 3:11-cv-198 is not appropriate at this time & would not serve the interests of judicial economy. Therefore, the Motion is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/22/2011. (jct)
March 21, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER tentatively granting 29 Request for Oral Argument filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. The Court will set a date for oral argument after a complete review of all the papers. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/21/2012. (jct)
April 23, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Daniel S. Connolly & Rachel Bess Goldman to bring electronic devises into the Courthouse in Little Rock on 4/25/2012, subject to the stated rules. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/23/2012. (jct)
May 11, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION that a national bank chartered by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency is authorized to do business within Arkansas. Therefore, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. was authorized to avail itself of the Arkansas Statutory Foreclosure Act. The Court will issue an appropriate Order in each of the five cases. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2012. (jct)
May 11, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 42 Memorandum Opinion entered this date, the decision of the Bankruptcy Court overruling the objections to confirmation in each of the three bankruptcy proceedings is reversed. The three cases are remanded to the Bankruptcy Court for further proceedings consisent with the Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA v. Johnson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tammy Renae Peeks
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: George Michael DeLoache
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tracy Lea Estes
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Daniel L Johnson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Susan D Johnson
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Mark T McCarty
Represented By: Mark Thomas McCarty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: David L. Williams
Represented By: Samuel M. Stricklin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]