Combined Insurance Company of America v. Thomas et al

Defendant: Debbie L Thomas and David W Thomas
Plaintiff: Combined Insurance Company of America
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00254
Filed: November 8, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER directing that the Defendants have until June 28, 2013 to inform the Court of the name and address of their new attorney or whether they intent to proceed pro se. If defendants require any further extensions of time, they are to contact the Plaintiff and then the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this Order on defendants by both regular mail and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/6/2013. (jak)
July 8, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER directing Defendants' attention to the fact that they are required to be familiar with and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this Order on defendants by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/8/2013. (jak)
August 1, 2013 36 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/1/2013. (jak)
August 1, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER directing the Defendants to provide to Plaintiff on or before August 7, 2013, full and complete response to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production of documents. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Defendants by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 08/01/2013. (jak)
August 9, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER regarding requirements and restrictions imposed on Defendants. This Order shall remain in full force and effect until the case is fully and finally concluded or until the Court otherwise orders. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/9/2013. (jak)
August 16, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER directing Defendants to respond to 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Constructive Trust on or before August 27, 2013. Failure to do so will result in the granting of the Motion. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on defendants by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/16/2013. (jak)
September 5, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER designating the trial of this matter to be conducted at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 600 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas, Courtroom A530. The Court will consider any timely objection the parties may have to m oving the trial from Jonesboro to Little Rock. Objections must be filed by 5:00 p.m. on September 16, 2013. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on defendant, Debbie L. Thomas, by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/5/2013. (jak)
September 6, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST with requirements listed within this Order to remain in full force and effect until the case is fully and finally concluded or until the Court otherwise orders. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/6/2013. (jak)
September 30, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay and for an Extension of Time. This matter is stayed indefinitely. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case. The trial set for October 7, 2013, is cancelled. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report or motion to lift stay no later than October 1, 2014. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Debbie Thomas by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/30/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Combined Insurance Company of America v. Thomas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie L Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combined Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]