Osceola Arkansas, City of v. Entergy Arkansas Inc et al

Plaintiff: Osceola Arkansas, City of
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc and Entergy Services Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00011
Filed: January 16, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss, 15 Motion to Remand, and 17 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/20/2013. (jak)
March 7, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER denying 52 Motion to Deem Admitted; denying 53 Motion to Strike. Defendants are directed to file an amended response to Osceola's statement of material facts that comports with Local Rule 56.1 by close of business on Monday, March 10, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/2014. (jak)
April 30, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/30/2014. (jak)
April 30, 2014 58 Featured Case JUDGMENT consistent with 57 Order, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/30/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Osceola Arkansas, City of v. Entergy Arkansas Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osceola Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Zachary David Wilson
Represented By: H. Mark Hicks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Scott C. Trotter
Represented By: Tucker Raney
Represented By: N. M. Norton, Jr.
Represented By: John S. Moot
Represented By: Matthew W.S. Estes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Services Inc
Represented By: Matthew W.S. Estes
Represented By: John S. Moot
Represented By: N. M. Norton, Jr.
Represented By: Tucker Raney
Represented By: Scott C. Trotter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]