Venegas et al v. Murray Drywall and Insulation of Texas Inc et al

Defendant: Lucas Enterprises Inc and Murray Drywall and Insulation of Texas Inc
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Venegas, Victor Hernandez, J Elias Balderas, Otziel Hernandez and Albino Balderas
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00036
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Letter filed by Jon W. Lucas. The Court will treat this letter as a motion, and hereby grants the motion. Separate Defendant Lucas Enterprises Inc has an additional thirty days in which to file an answer to the complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/01/2013. (jak)
May 17, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Defendant Murray Drywall and Insulation of Texas Inc. Motion to Stay. The Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline is hereby set for ten (10) days after the Court rules on defendant's motion to dismiss and plaintiffs' motion fo r leave to file an amended collective action complaint. The Rule 26(f) Report due date is hereby set for fourteen (14) days after the Rule 26(f) Conference deadline. The deadline for initial disclosure shall be adjusted according to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/17/2013. (jak)
December 3, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 40 Joint Motion for Certification of Collective Action Class and Issuance of Notice. The Court certifies the collective action class defined as: Generally, all non-exempt employees of Lucas Enterprises, Inc. who performed work at t he NEA Baptist Memorial Hospital construction site located in Jonesboro, Arkansas from November 28, 2011 through February 28, 2013, who were not paid time and one-half their hourly rate for all hours worked over 40 in a workweek. The Class is furthe r defined specifically as the following persons: Oscar Acosta, Albino Balderas, Elias Balderas, Alberto Casillas, Nataneal (Natalia/Natelino) Diaz, Oscar Diaz, John Hazerd, Armando Hernandez, Otziel Hernandez, Victor Hernandez, Salvador Ibarra, Rayn aldo Rivas (Cruz), Garret Vinning, and Marco Venegas. The Court further orders the Settlement Administrator to issue notice to the class members in the form attached to the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/3/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Venegas et al v. Murray Drywall and Insulation of Texas Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Enterprises Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Drywall and Insulation of Texas Inc
Represented By: Steven Wright Likens
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Venegas
Represented By: Timothy P. Taylor
Represented By: Deborah E Godwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Hernandez
Represented By: Timothy P. Taylor
Represented By: Deborah E Godwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Elias Balderas
Represented By: Deborah E Godwin
Represented By: Timothy P. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otziel Hernandez
Represented By: Deborah E Godwin
Represented By: Timothy P. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albino Balderas
Represented By: Deborah E Godwin
Represented By: Timothy P. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]