Burns v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Melisa Burns
Defendant: Social Security Administration
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00043
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER inviting counsel to advise the Court within fifteen days of the entry of this Order to schedule an oral argument. At counsel's choosing, oral argument may be in person or by teleconference. The scope of the argument is limited solely to the record before the Court and additional evidence will not be considered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/21/2014(jak)
May 21, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 24 Memorandum Opinion and Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/21/2014. (jak)
May 30, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file proof of service with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order, or the Complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/30/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burns v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melisa Burns
Represented By: Alan V. Seagrave, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]