Smith v. Arkansas, State of et al

Defendant: Mike Middleton, April Cantrell, Rick G McKelvey, Desoto County Sheriff Department, Barry E Roy, Arkansas State Police, Arkansas, State of, Thomas D Deen, Dermott School District, J Bigham and Pam Stephenson
Plaintiff: Fred Smith
Case Number: 3:2013cv00050
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Fred Smith's complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Pam Stephenson. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/21/2013. (jak)
October 28, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving Notice to the Plaintiff, Fred Smith, that if he does not file a response to 31 MOTION to Dismiss and 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on or before November 4, 2013, the Court will assume that he does not oppose them and will act accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/2013. (jak)
November 5, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 and 33 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Fred Smith's claims against J. Bigham, Desoto County Sheriff Department, Arkansas State Police, Thomas D. Deen, Mike Middleton, Rick McKelvey, and Barry Roy, in their individual and official capacities, are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/5/2013. (jak)
November 14, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving notice to Plaintiff that the Court will dismiss this action as to the State of Arkansas unless proof of service is filed on or before Monday, December 16, 2013, or the plaintiff establishes good cause for the failure to serve summons and complaint on the State of Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/2013. (jak)
August 7, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing the trial date in this case based on agreement by the parties. A new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/7/2014. (jak)
October 28, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving notice to Plaintiff that if he fails to file a response to the Motions to Dismiss by the close of business November 4, 2014, the Court will assume that he does not oppose the motions and will act accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/28/2014. (jak)
October 31, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting the motions to dismiss filed by April Cantrell and the Dermott School District, 50 and 51 . Fred Smith's claims against April Cantrell and the Dermott School District are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/31/2014. (jak)
October 31, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 56 Opinion and Order, Judgment is entered in favor of the defendants on the claims of Fred Smith. The 2 Complaint of Fred Smith is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/31/2014. (jak)
June 17, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving notice to the Plaintiff that the Court will dismiss this action unless proof of service is filed on or before Wednesday, July 17, 2013, or the Plaintiff establishes good cause for the failure to serve summons and complaint on the defendants within 120 days after the filing of the complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/17/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Middleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Cantrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick G McKelvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto County Sheriff Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry E Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Police
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D Deen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermott School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Bigham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Stephenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]