Johnson v. Arkansas, State of et al

Defendant: Randolph County, Arkansas, Arkansas, State of and Pocahontas Arkansas, City of
Plaintiff: Jackie D Johnson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00063
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 9 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Accordingly, Johnson's complaint against Randolph County, Arkansas, is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 05/02/2013. (jak)
May 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion for Judgment; denying 17 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 05/03/2013. (jak)
June 25, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Defendant State of Arkansas Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time. Johnson's time for responding to 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Pocahontas is extended up to twenty-one days after the City of Pocahontas responds to his discovery requests. Johnson's motion for extension of time is denied as to the State of Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 06/25/2013. (jak)
July 31, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Plaintiff Johnson's claims against Randolph County, Arkansas and the City of Pocahontas without prejudice. Granting 35 Motion to Dismiss. Because the State of Arkansas is entitled to sovereign immunity, Johnson's claims against the State are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/2013. (jak)
July 31, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 43 Order dismissing Jackie D. Johnson's claims against the State of Arkansas with prejudice, while his claims against Randolph County, Arkansas, and the City of Pocahontas, Arkansas, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/2013. (jak)
March 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's attention to the fact that Plaintiff is required to be familiar and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claim. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve this Order on plaintiff by both regular mail and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 03/25/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph County, Arkansas
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocahontas Arkansas, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie D Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]