Haukereid v. National Passenger Railroad Corporation

Defendant: National Passenger Railroad Corporation
Plaintiff: Scott Haukereid
Case Number: 3:2013cv00092
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. All other motions, 77 , 79 , 81 , and 83 are denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/2014. (jak)
November 4, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Haukereid's complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/4/2014. (jak)
June 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting 7 Motion to file an Amended Complaint; denying 3 Motion for an Order to preserve evidence; and denying as moot 5 Motion for leave to serve a subpoena. Amended Complaint, minus the outrage claim, due by July 3, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/25/2013. (jak)
December 13, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relating actions taken by the Court following the 12 December 2013 discovery hearing. Supplemental production by each party due by 15 January 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/2013. (jak)
December 23, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2013. (jak)
June 26, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER addressing the discovery issues in the third and fourth joint reports 41 and 43 . Granting in part and mostly denying in part 44 Motion to Continue. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2014. (jak)
July 3, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion for Ruling. The Court orders production of documents at issue by 18 July 2014 with a privilege log if anything is withheld. The parties must notify the Court by July 23 if there's any dispute about a privilege issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/2014. (jak)
July 18, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Amtrak to file a short response on Tuesday, after it makes the supplemental production. The Court will rule promptly thereafter. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2014. (jak)
July 22, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re telephone conference held 22 July 2014 regarding the disagreement between counsel about the informal interviews. The Court directed that all of the interviews previously ordered would go forward so that Haukereid can confirm with each listed person whether he or she was actually on the train, and if so, ask follow-up questions. After the Court's ruling, the lawyers went back to work conducting the informal interviews. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2014. (jak)
July 24, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to send no more letters to Chambers regarding discovery disputes. A Joint Report on the issues about written discovery on other incidents due by July 28. The Court will hold a hearing on all the current discovery issues on Friday, 1 August 2014 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment No. 1 - Amtrak Letter, # 2 Attachment No. 2 - Haukereid Letter, # 3 Attachment No. 3 - Amtrak Response Letter)(jak)
August 1, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding the 8/1/2014 hearing. Amtrak's privilege claims, 56 & 65 , are approved. Amtrak's request for a protective order, 61 , is granted temporarily. The Order will expire on 8 September 2014. Haukereid's request for relief, [ 55]& 59 are denied. Haukereid's request for prior incident reports, 62 , is granted in part and denied in part. Production due by 15 August 2014. Haukereid's request for subsequent incident reports, 63 , is granted as to Dowd, Madison, H att, and Diaby. Haukereid's request for leave to take depositions, 64 , is granted in part and denied in part. He may depose Kelly and Tullos for three hours each. The request is denied as to Jordan. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haukereid v. National Passenger Railroad Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Passenger Railroad Corporation
Represented By: Kristopher Bruce Knox
Represented By: Scott H. Tucker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Haukereid
Represented By: Carter C. Stein
Represented By: J. Bruce McMath
Represented By: Neil R. Chamberlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]