Earls v. Paragould Police Department et al

Defendant: Dan Stidham, Todd Stovall, Paragould Police Department, Rick Mellow and Does
Plaintiff: Jacob Thomas Earls
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00200
Filed: September 9, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Clay
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Earls copies of the docket sheet and docket entries 1 , 2 , 3 , 4 , 7 , 8 , and 9 . Earls's time to file an amended complaint is extended until 14 March 2014. If he does not do so, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/13/2014. (jak)
April 2, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Stovall, G. McClung, and H. McClung. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint and 13 Amended Complaint and summons for each of these defendants. If Mr. Earls wants to proceed against the Doe Defendants, he must identify those persons within 120 days so that they can be properly served. Mr. Earls' 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/2/2014. (jak)
April 23, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 16 Partial Report and Recommendations. Earls's claims against the Paragould Police Department, Dan Stidham, and Rick Mellow, as well as his access-to-courts claim, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/23/2014. (jak)
October 1, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 34 Recommended Disposition. 32 Motion to Dismiss is granted. 35 Motion to Compel denied as moot. All of Earls's claims are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/2014. (jak)
October 1, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Earls's 2 Complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/1/2014. (jak)
January 23, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order as well as 4 Order to Earls at his new address. Earls must file an amended complaint by 24 February 2014 or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Earls v. Paragould Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Stidham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Stovall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragould Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Mellow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Thomas Earls
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]