Neill v. Knauts et al

Plaintiff: Brandy Ann Neill
Defendant: C W Knauts, Shane Adam Neill, Gerald McClung and Robin Nagy
Case Number: 3:2014cv00011
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, parties must complete discovery by 8/5/2014, and file any dispositive motions by 9/4/2014. Both Defendants are granted permission to depose Paintiff, if they so choose. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/07/2014. (kcs)
September 3, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, a Response to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C W Knauts and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions set forth in this Order; and Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply will result in: (a) all of the facts in 14 being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/03/2014. (kcs)
September 5, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, a Response to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerald McClung and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Local Rule and instructions set forth in this Order. Pla intiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in 18 being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/05/2014. (kcs)
March 20, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 28 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendant McClung's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and the claims against him are dismissed, without p rejudice. Defendant Knauts' 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and the claim against him is dismissed with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/2015. (jak)
March 20, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 31 Order, this case is dismissed. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/2015. (jak)
January 15, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/15/2014. (kcs)
February 20, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER dismissing without prejudice Neill's claims against Neill and Nagy. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for McClung and Knauts, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, substituted complaint, and this Opinion and Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/20/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neill v. Knauts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Ann Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C W Knauts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Adam Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McClung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.