Whitlock v. Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield et al

Plaintiff: Amber Whitlock
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield and Health Advantage
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv00243
Filed: March 26, 2008
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 American Disability Act for Handicapped

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures: plaintiff shall have up to and including 6/22/09 to serve Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/16/09. (bkp)
July 17, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/17/09. (bkp)
October 9, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; Pltf's claims are dismissed with prejudice; Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/9/09. (mkf)
October 9, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/9/09. (mkf)
November 18, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Bill of Costs filed by Health Advantage, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/18/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Whitlock v. Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Whitlock
Represented By: Stephen E. Fisher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Advantage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]