Frazier et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Defendant: Ford Motor Company
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv04153
Filed: November 14, 2008
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2008 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Motion for Limited Admission of Robert L. Wise on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/08. (bkp)
March 20, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's claims against Party Newell Rubbermaid, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/09. (bkp)
October 31, 2008 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 78 Objection(s) filed by Ford Motor Company, amending third paragraph in the conclusion of 69 magistrate judge's order as further set forth in this order. Signed by J. Leon Holmes on October 31, 2008. (cap)[Transferred from arwd on 11/14/2008.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Frazier et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Patrick Darrow Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]