Kelley et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Kristina Lee Kelley, Casi Riggs and Courtney Fuchs
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor America Inc and John Does
Case Number: 4:2009cv00894
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on objections to deposition designations and counter-designations, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/1/11. (kpr)
August 1, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on deposition designations and counter-designations, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/1/11. (kpr)
August 18, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 159 Jury Verdict. The plaintiffs take nothing on this complaint and their claims are dismissed. Defts/Third Party Plaintiffs take nothing on their third-party complaint against Joseph Gerke, and it is also dismissed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/18/11. (kpr)
November 19, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint filed by Hyundai Motor America Inc and directing deft to file its Third-Party Complaint within five days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/19/10. (bkp)
April 21, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 42 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/21/11. (kpr)
May 5, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting pretrial conference for Friday, May 20, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4A, Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, AR. Jury selection will begin at 2:00 p.m. The Court will begin with opening statements on Monday, May 23, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/5/11. (kpr)
May 16, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/16/11. (kpr)
May 16, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Strike Door Latch Opinions Due to Spoliation. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/16/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Lee Kelley
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casi Riggs
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Fuchs
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.