Rice v. Luken Communications LLC et al

Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Defendant: Luken Communications LLC and Henry G Luken, III
Case Number: 4:2011cv00386
Filed: May 5, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 105 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Trial in this matter remains set as scheduled for Monday, June 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/7/13. (kpr)
June 10, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Luken Communications LLC. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/10/13. (kpr)
June 10, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This Order does not prevent Trustee Rice from rearguing points made in his motion for partial summary judgment, if this case reaches the stage where the Court is required to make the § 550 determination. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/10/13. (kpr)
June 11, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 101 Luken Communications's Second Motion in Limine to exclude "valuation" reports and objection to business records classification. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/11/2013. (thd)
June 11, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 103 Luken Communications LLC's Motion in Limine to exclude expert report and opinion of Karen G. Nicolaou as untimely. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/11/2013. (thd)
June 14, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion in Limine in part and reserving ruling on part until the time of trial. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/14/13. (kpr)
June 17, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Gregory H. Bevel, Kerry Ann Miller, M. Randy Rice, Scott M. DeWolf, Allison Rantisi Gladden, and James E. Smith, Jr., as well as Paul French and Henry Luken to bring certain electronics into the Courthouse on Monday, June 17, 2013, through the duration of the trial, subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/17/13. (kpr)
August 16, 2013 148 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered on the jury's verdict and in accordance with the Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law of even date in favor of Trustee Rice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/16/2013. (dmn)
October 28, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 174 joint motion for order setting aside the 148 judgment and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/28/2014. (rhm)
June 6, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions for Gregory H. Bevel 13 , Scott M. DeWolf 14 , and Kerry Ann Miller 15 to Appear pro hac vice as special counsel in this matter for the Trustee. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/6/11. (vjt)
November 15, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/15/11. (vjt)
March 20, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 40 Motion to Compel; denying deft's 41 Motion for Extension of Time; directing deft to supplement its answers to interrogatory Nos. 19 and 20 within 14 days from the entry of this Order, and also submit a second set of answers to interrogatories with the general objections deleted. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/20/12. (vjt)
April 2, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying deft's 35 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/2/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Luken Communications LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Randy Rice
Represented By: Kerry Ann Miller
Represented By: Scott M. DeWolf
Represented By: Gregory H. Bevel
Represented By: M. Randy Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luken Communications LLC
Represented By: Debra K. Brown
Represented By: Allison Rantisi Gladden
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry G Luken, III
Represented By: Debra K. Brown
Represented By: Allison Rantisi Gladden
Represented By: John Peyton Perkins, III
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Represented By: James E. Smith, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]