Lovston v. Skechers USA Inc

Plaintiff: Terena Lovston
Defendant: Skechers USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2011cv00460
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER remanding this case to the Circuit Court of Lonoke County, Arkansas, for want of jurisdiction. The Court stays the remand until August 5, 2011 and invites the parties' arguments on this planned disposition in the meantime. The 6 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/11. (kpr)
July 26, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/26/11. (kpr)
August 26, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER lifting stay and denying 3 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice. The stay is reinstated on its previous terms. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/25/11. (kpr)
July 12, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER remanding this case to the Circuit Court of Lonoke County, Arkansas for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovston v. Skechers USA Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terena Lovston
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skechers USA Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Barker
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Represented By: Amy Lee Stewart
Represented By: Amanda K. Wofford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]