Hiser v. XTO Energy Inc

Defendant: XTO Energy Inc
Plaintiff: Ruby Hiser
Case Number: 4:2011cv00517
Filed: June 24, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/18/13. (kpr)
April 23, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER taking under advisement XTO's pending post-trial motions. The Court will conduct an inquiry of certain jurors. Counsel may attend this inquiry, and the Court will confer with counsel in advance of the proceedings. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/23/13. (kpr)
July 26, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 110 Order on jury examination. Jurors set forth in this Order will be examined in Courtroom 4C of the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse. Counsel may submit proposed questions by July 31, 2013. At the conclusion of each examination, the Court will conduct a bench conference with counsel to determine whether additional questions should be asked. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/26/13. (kpr)
August 30, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. If the parties wish to make further requests of the Court or submissions for the Courts consideration regarding the pending post-trial motions in this matter, they are directed to do so on or before September 10,2013. The parties are directed to refrain from contacting jurors.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/30/13. (kpr)
September 30, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 85 Motion for Costs. Plaintiff is allowed $484.36 in costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/13. (kpr)
September 30, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying XTO's renewed motion for judgment as a matter of lawand motion for new trial 98 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/13. (kpr)
August 14, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/14/12. (kpr)
August 14, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/14/12. (kpr)
August 24, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/24/2012. (jlp)
August 31, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's motion to contact jurors by 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/31/12. (kpr)
September 10, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Ruby Hiser and against XTO Energy Inc in the amount of $300,000.00, together with post-judgment interest at the rate of 0.18% per annum from the date of the Judgment until paid pursuant to 76 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiser v. XTO Energy Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy Inc
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: James D. Rankin, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Hiser
Represented By: Joseph D. Hughes
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]