Jim Venable Company Inc v. Delvalle et al

Defendant: Elizabeth Delvalle, David Delvalle and Window Depot of Buffalo LLC
Plaintiff: Jim Venable Company Inc
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00639
Filed: August 19, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 MOTION for Injunctive Relief. The hearing on this motion is continued to October 7, 2011 at 9 a.m.; the parties may conduct discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction between now and October 7th; David Delvalle may not repesent the interests of Window Depot of Buffalo, LLC. If the Delvalles intend to continue representing themselves, they must immediately provide the Court and opposite counsel with current working telephone numbers and e-mail addresses; plaintiff is directed to give defts notice of the October 7th hearing,and to file proof of notice, by September 30, 2011; and the Clerk is directed to serve this Order via regular and certified mail upon David Delvalle. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/23/11. (kpr) Modified on 9/23/2011 to correct typos (tjj).
November 22, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 3 Permanent Injunction and enjoining David DelValle until July 15, 2012, from operating any similar or competing business within the Buffalo Territory, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/11. (kpr)
April 12, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The complaint and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/12. (kpr)
April 12, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 33 Order dismissing the complaint and counterclaims with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jim Venable Company Inc v. Delvalle et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Delvalle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Delvalle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Window Depot of Buffalo LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Venable Company Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Represented By: Rashauna A. Norment
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]