McFadden One LLC v. Residences at Riverdale GP LLC et al

Plaintiff: McFadden One LLC
Defendant: Residences at Riverdale GP LLC, Residences at Riverdale LP, David F Stapleton and Nations Construction Management Incorporated
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00748
Filed: October 14, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Nations's 7 Motion to Dismiss McFadden's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/6/12. (vjt)
February 8, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties have up to and including 10 days from the entry of this Order to file any objections or concerns regarding the proposed consolidation of a joint trial in cases 4:11CV00748 and 4:10CV00330. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/8/12. (vjt)
February 24, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that cases 4:10CV00330 and 4:11CV00748 are hereby consolidated for the purpose of trial only; the cases will not merge into a single action, and the parties should continue to make filings in the separate cases. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/24/12. (vjt)
March 23, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/12. (vjt)
July 11, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 23 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/11/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McFadden One LLC v. Residences at Riverdale GP LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McFadden One LLC
Represented By: Roger H. Fitzgibbon, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residences at Riverdale GP LLC
Represented By: Patrick Darrow Wilson
Represented By: James Andrew Vines
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residences at Riverdale LP
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: James Andrew Vines
Represented By: Patrick Darrow Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F Stapleton
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Represented By: James Andrew Vines
Represented By: Patrick Darrow Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nations Construction Management Incorporated
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Represented By: Allen C. Dobson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]