Lambert v. LQ Management LLC

Defendant: LQ Management LLC
Plaintiff: John R Lambert, II
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00075
Filed: February 3, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 15 Featured Case OPINION ARKANSAS SUPREME COURT re 11 Certification of Issue to State Court. Signed by Judge Karen R. Baker, Associate Justice(kpr)
April 29, 2013 18 Featured Case JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 17 Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/29/2013. (dmn)
July 30, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/30/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lambert v. LQ Management LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management LLC
Represented By: Andrew T. Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Lambert, II
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]