Brown et al v. Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Karen Brown, Justin Brown, Johnathon Brown and Does
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 4:2012cv00140
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Brown to make the changes set forth in this Order and re-file her complaint by August 21, 2012, and then serve it on the defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/14/12. (kpr)
March 12, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants CMS, Dr. DeSaint Felix, and Dr. Anderson are dismissed. Denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Joint report due from the remaining parties by 21 March 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/12/2014. (jak)
April 1, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing claims against the ADC and Dr. Antosh without prejudice. Brown's official-capacity claims against the John Does 1-3 are dismissed as moot. The Court will issue an Amended Final Scheduling Order soon. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/1/2014. (ks)
October 3, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating parts of 31 Order. Unopposed motion to reconsider, 35 , granted. CMS, and its employees, Drs. De Saint Felix and Anderson, are reinstated as defendants. The Court directs the Clerk to send this Order to Mr. Humphries, their lawyer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/3/2014. (jak)
December 22, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/22/2014. (jak)
January 30, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 57 Motion to deem admitted. The Court deems Brown to have admitted all the facts asserted in Hobbs's Local Rule 56.1 statement with one carve out, Where Hobbs's statement overlaps with the medical defendants 9;, 40 , the Court deems admitted only the facts that Brown admitted in responding, 54 , to the medical defendants' statement. Hobbs's uncontested motion for summary judgment, 41 , is granted. Brown's claims against Hobbs are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2015. (jak)
March 12, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Brown's motion to continue, 61 , is granted as modified. Discovery is reopened until 29 May 2015 with limitations contained within this Order. Any expert and his or her opinions must be disclosed by 30 April 2015. Brown must file any ad denda to her papers responding to summary judgment by 5 June 2015. The healthcare defendants may file addenda in reply by 19 June 2015. Thereafter, the Court will rule on the dispositive motion. The Court pre-authorizes counsel to spend up to $2 ,500.00 from the Court's Library Fund on a causation expert. The Second Amended Final Scheduling Order, 51 , is suspended and the 11 May 2015 trial is canceled. A Third Amended Final Scheduling Order setting trial for 17 August 2015, and setting pretrial deadlines,will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/12/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.