Dial et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc Trust 2006-HE3, Thomas J Morton and Wannetta Y Morton
Plaintiff: Johnathan D Dial and Lydia A Dial
Case Number: 4:2012cv00180
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's Motion to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint 5 11 ; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company answer due 4/22/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/28/12. (vjt)
April 12, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Laya Rose Kaigh to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for deft. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/12. (vjt)
April 12, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Elizabeth A. Frohlich to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for deft. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/12. (vjt)
April 24, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting separate deft's 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Answer to the Amended Complaint; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company answer due 4/30/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/12. (vjt)
September 26, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Johnathan and Lydia Dial's motion to remand 42 is GRANTED; this action is remanded to the Circuit Court of Pulaski County, Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/26/12. (vjt) (Docket entry modified on 9/27/2012 to correct the file date.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dial et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Frohlich
Represented By: Laya R. Kaigh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc Trust 2006-HE3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Morton
Represented By: Paul A. Schmidt, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wannetta Y Morton
Represented By: Paul A. Schmidt, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan D Dial
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Represented By: Christopher L. Travis
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia A Dial
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Represented By: Christopher L. Travis
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]