Lind v. Allen & Withrow et al

Defendant: Allen & Withrow and TLO LLC
Plaintiff: Derek Lind
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00588
Filed: September 13, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Mr. Lind's claims against separate defendant TLO are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/1/13. (kpr)
November 22, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 41 Motion to Strike Mr. Lind's response to the motion for fees 44 ; and denying 47 Mo tion for Sanctions. Within ten days of the date of this Order, Ms. Hatcher and Mr. Thompson should inform the Court of how to make checks payable to each of them for attorneys fees. Within ten days of the date of this Order, Ms. Hatcher and Mr. Tho mpson should inform the Court of how to make checks payable to each of them for attorneys fees. The Court will then direct the Clerk of Court to make payment to Ms. Hatcher and Mr. Thompson for attorneys fees consistent with this Order, remitting the remainder to Mr. Lind as a portion of his settlement in this matter. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/22/13. (kpr)
January 10, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE and removing it from the trial docket for the week of February 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lind v. Allen & Withrow et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Withrow
Represented By: Deborah S. Denton
Represented By: Janet L. Pulliam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLO LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Lind
Represented By: Lorraine Hatcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]