Garrison v. Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC

Plaintiff: Evelyn Garrison
Defendant: Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00737
Filed: November 21, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Andrew J. Weissler and Josef S. Glynia to bring certain electronics into the courthouse on March 19, 2013 for a hearing before Judge Susan Webber Wright subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/18/13. (kpr)
March 27, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 5 motion for conditional certification under the FLSA of collective action, equitable tolling, for disclosure of contact information for potential opt-in pltfs, and to send court-approved notice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/27/13. (vjt)
June 19, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending the motions deadline up to and including June 27, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/19/2014. (jak)
August 1, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion. The Clerk is directed to substitute the signed plaintiffs' declarations that are attached to plaintiffs' motion for substitution 75 for the unsigned declarations that are attached to plaintiffs' response 73 to defendant's motion for summary judgment. The time for defendant to file a reply is extended up to and including August 11, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/1/2014. (jak)
October 9, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion for Sanctions. The Court hereby dismisses plaintiff Ruben Garcia from this action. ConAgra's 69 Motion for Summary Judgment remains pending. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/9/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garrison v. Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Garrison
Represented By: Jon R. Sanford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods Packaged Foods LLC
Represented By: Brittany M. Ems
Represented By: Josef S. Glynias
Represented By: Andrew J. Weissler
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]