JD Fields & Company Inc v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company

Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Plaintiff: J D Fields & Company Inc
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00754
Filed: December 5, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 20 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd) [Transferred from txsd on 12/5/2012.]
September 30, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/13. (kpr)
April 11, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/11/2014. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JD Fields & Company Inc v. Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor-Yamato Steel Company
Represented By: Robert J. Katerberg
Represented By: Douglas R. Gunson
Represented By: Jason Ewart
Represented By: Haley Heath Burks
Represented By: M. Tim Boe
Represented By: Walter Moreau Berger
Represented By: Donna E. Patterson
Represented By: Michael D. Thorpe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J D Fields & Company Inc
Represented By: Robert Glen Moll
Represented By: W. Rick Sellars
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Sullivan
Represented By: Peter O. Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Steven P. Vangel
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]