Nichols v. Tri-National Logistics Inc et al

Defendant: Donald Lewis, Tri-National Logistics Inc, RMR Driver Services Inc, James Paris and Charles Kye
Plaintiff: Rebecca L Nichols
Case Number: 4:2013cv00124
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Baxter
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 124 Motion for Discovery; granting 125 Motion for Leave to File an Answer and Counterclaim by July 29, 2014; granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/8/2014. (jak)
August 21, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Nichols's claims against TNI, RMR, Kye, and Lewis are dismissed. The 128 motion to strike is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/21/2014.(ks)
December 17, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 142 Opinion and Order and 154 Order, Plaintiff Rebecca L. Nichols's claims against Defendants Tri-National Logistics, Inc.; RMR Driver Services, Inc.; Charles Kye; and Donald Lewis are dismissed with prejudice. Plaint iffs Title VII, FCRA, and ACRA claims against Defendant James Paris are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claim of outrage against Paris and Paris's counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/17/2014. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Tri-National Logistics Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lewis
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-National Logistics Inc
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMR Driver Services Inc
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Paris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Kye
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca L Nichols
Represented By: Melanie J. McClure
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]