Coulter v. Wiggins et al

Defendant: Wiggins Childs Quinn and Pantazis LLC and Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Plaintiff: Nate Coulter
Intervenor: Sylvester Rogers, Clifton Lee, Cornelius Bennett, Ozzie Green and Larry McBride
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00267
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER rescheduling this action for a jury trial on the same date currently set for the bench trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/13/2014. (ks)
February 10, 2014 59 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 17 motion for summary judgment by Rogers, Bennett, and Lee against Wiggins; denying 38 motion for summary judgment by Wiggins against McBride, Green, Rogers, Bennett, and Lee; denying 39 motion for summary judgment by Wiggins against Coulter. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/10/2014. (mmd)
April 30, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to 71 stipulation filed on this date, this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/30/2014. (mmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coulter v. Wiggins et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiggins Childs Quinn and Pantazis LLC
Represented By: Dennis G Pantazis
Represented By: Robert L. Wiggins, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Wiggins, Jr
Represented By: Robert L. Wiggins, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Coulter
Represented By: John Richard Byrd, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sylvester Rogers
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Clifton Lee
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cornelius Bennett
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ozzie Green
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Larry McBride
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]