Kay et al v. Peak Water Systems LLC et al

Defendant: Peak Water Systems LLC and Foxborough Energy Company LLC
Plaintiff: Laura Kay and Marvin Kay
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00487
Filed: August 23, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Peak Water Systems LLC, 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Foxborough Energy Company LLC. The Court directs Kay to respond to both motions by November 8, 2013. Either a combined response, or separate responses, will be fine. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/13. (kpr)
November 15, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 18 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Foxborough's answer due by 12/06/2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2013. (rhm)
February 27, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/27/2014. (jak)
March 28, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion. The Court will hold an in-person status conference on 1 April 2014 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom #B-155. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/28/2014. (jak)
July 22, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Compel. Peak and Foxborough are entitled to much of what they seek, though not all. Plaintiffs' supplemental responses due by 15 August 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice as premature 59 and 62 Motions to Strike. Peak's supplemental discovery responses and status report due by 1 August 2014; and any resulting joint report due by 13 August 2014. The scheduling of Plaintiffs' expert's deposition will hang fire pending resolution of the discovery-response issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)
October 31, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for Sanctions; denying without prejudice 92 Motion to Strike as premature. The Court assesses no attorney's fees. The new deadlines are as follows: Dispositive Motions, including all expert-related motions by 15 December 2014; Responses by 23 January 2015; Replies by 13 February 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/31/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kay et al v. Peak Water Systems LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Water Systems LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxborough Energy Company LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Kay
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Kay
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]