Smith v. Fredd et al

Defendant: Allen Cheeks, Tobey Smith, Robby Fredd and Christian Scott
Plaintiff: Reginal Lonniel Smith
Case Number: 4:2013cv00709
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 Amended Complaint filed by Reginal Lonniel Smith. Service is appropriate for Defendants Robby Fredd, Tobey Smith and Allen Cheek. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the Amended Complaint 9 and summons on defendants without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/21/14. (kpr)
February 10, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety. Accordingly, Defendant Cheek is dismissed from this action, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/10/2014. (ks)
June 17, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 34 Memorandum and Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/17/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Fredd et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Cheeks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobey Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robby Fredd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginal Lonniel Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]