Kennedy v. Ferguson

Plaintiff: John Kennedy
Defendant: Gibbs Ferguson
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv00184
Filed: July 15, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 21 Featured Case LETTER ORDER re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gibbs Ferguson. The pltf is directed to provide a letter brief on the standing issue by 5 p.m., Thuesday, August 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/24/11. (kpr)
September 16, 2011 23 Featured Case ORDER granting deft's motions to dismiss 7 15 and DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/16/11. (kpr)
September 19, 2011 24 Featured Case JUDGMENT re 23 Order dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/19/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kennedy v. Ferguson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kennedy
Represented By: J. Ray Baxter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibbs Ferguson
Represented By: Charles S. Gibson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]