Robinson v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al

Defendant: Vulcan Materials Company, Does, 3M Company, Pangborn Corporation, Clark Sand Company Inc, Dependable Abrasives Inc, Precision Packaging Inc, Morie Company, Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company, E D Bullard Company, Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation, Empire Abrasive Equipment Company LP, Clemco Industries Inc, Schmidt Manufacturing Inc, Bob Schmidt Inc, Pauli & Griffin Company, Kelco Sales & Engineering Company, Mississippi Valley Silica Co Inc, Standard Sand & Silica Company, Unimin Corporation, Doe Corporation, American Optical Corporation and Mine Safety Appliances Company
Plaintiff: Hershel Lee Robinson
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00383
Filed: October 5, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Status conference will be held in Little Rock on July 16, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. in Room B155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse. Counsel for all partie s must attend. Robinson's response to Clark's Sand's statement of undisputed material facts is stricken for noncompliance with the Court's Scheduling Order. The Amended Complaint is due by August 15, 2013. Robinson should wait until after the status conference before amending. Robinson's conforming statement is due by June 14th. clark Sand's reply is due by June 21st. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/6/13. (kpr)
July 15, 2013 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing W. Mark Edwards, Matthew R. Dowd and Daniel J. Mulholland to bring certain electronics into the Courthouse on July 16, 2013, pursuant to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/15/13. (kpr)
July 25, 2013 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 184 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims and cross claims against Vulcan Materials are dismissed without prejudice. The 86 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is granted, and Attorney Mark Clyde Burgess terminated. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/25/13. (kpr)
August 19, 2013 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 195 Motion to Dismiss Parties and dismissing all claims against Empire Abrasive Equipment Co. L.P., Schmidt Manufacturing Inc., Bob Schmidt Inc., Pauli & Griffin Co., and Kelco Sales & Engineering Co., without prejudice, and dismissing all these parties' cross claims without prejudice, too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/19/13. (kpr)
September 30, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 215 Motion to Dismiss Party. All of plaintiff's claims and cross claims against Mississippi Valley Silica Company are dismissed without prejudice. The 208 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/30/13. (kpr)
December 20, 2013 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 239 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's claims against Unimin Corporation, The Morie Company, Inc., and Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel, without prejudice. All cross claims against these three parties are dismissed without prejudice, too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/20/13. (kpr)
January 29, 2014 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 257 unopposed motion to dismiss and dismissing without prejudice all of Robinson's claims and all cross claims against Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2014. (thd)
February 7, 2014 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 279 motion; supplementing 198 Order entered 8/19/2013; and dismissing 258 all of Robinson's claims and all cross claims against all the Doe Defendants without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/07/2014.
February 26, 2014 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 307 opposed motion to continue. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. The 306 motion to strike Robinson's belated discovery is denied as moot. The Court would appreciate a complete condensed transcript of any deposition cited as an exhibit in any filed paper. Supplemental filings due by 3/3/2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/26/2014. (ks)
March 18, 2014 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 337 Motion to Stay the Summary Judgment briefing. Robinson's responses due by 20 March 2014. Any replies due by 31 March 2014. The disclosure issues should be explored at Dr. Ridgeway's upcoming deposition. Defendants may then file a separate motion for sanctions if they choose to do so. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/18/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 369 Motion for Sanctions. The motions for summary judgment 303 , 309 , 313 are granted. Mine Safety Appliances Company, Pangborn Corporation, Precision Packaging Inc., E.D. Bullard Company, and Clemco Industries Inc. are entitled to Judgment as a matter of law. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)
July 28, 2014 379 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing this case. Robinson's claims against Dependable Abrasives, Inc., Standard Sand & Silica Co., Vulcan Materials Co., Empire Abrasive Equipment Co. L.P., Schmidt Manufacturing Inc., Bob Schmidt Inc., Pauli & Griffin Co., Kelc o Sales & Engineering Co., Mississippi Valley Silica Co. Inc., Unimin Corp., Morie Co., Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Co., Empire Abrasive Equipment Corp., 3M Co., and all Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. All cross claims by and against t hose parties are dismissed without prejudice too. Robinson's claims against Clark Sand Co. Inc. and American Optical Corp. are dismissed with prejudice. All cross claims by and against Clark Sand Co. Inc. and American Optical Corp. are dismisse d without prejudice. Robinson's complaint against Mine Safety Appliances Co., Pangborn Corp., Precision Packaging Inc., E. D. Bullard Co., and Clemco Industries Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. All cross claims by and against these parties are dismissed without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinson v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vulcan Materials Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pangborn Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Sand Company Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dependable Abrasives Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Packaging Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morie Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E D Bullard Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Abrasive Equipment Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Abrasive Equipment Company LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemco Industries Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schmidt Manufacturing Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Schmidt Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauli & Griffin Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelco Sales & Engineering Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Valley Silica Co Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Sand & Silica Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimin Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hershel Lee Robinson
Represented By: Patrick C. Malouf
Represented By: Robert Allen Smith, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]