Spilker v. GEICO General Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kathy Spilker
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv00438
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Drew
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 request for settlement conference filed by Kathy Spilker, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/14/14. (kpr)
February 14, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFESSED JUDGMENT pursuant to the joint 40 stipulation of the parties, in favor of plaintiff Kathy Spilker against defendant GEICO General Insurance Company. The court will retain jurisdiction over this case to entertain motions that have not been resolved. The Clerk of the Court is directed not to term this case.. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/14/2014. (mmd)
July 9, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/09/2014. (rhm)
July 14, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 52 Order entered by the Court on 07/09/2014, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that defendant Geico General Insurance Company is not liable to plaintiff Kathy Spilker for attorney's fees or a statutory penalty. Because all other issues were resolved in the 42 Confessed Judgment, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/14/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spilker v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Spilker
Represented By: Linda Dykes Lamb
Represented By: Hani W. Hashem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]