Nelson v. Davenport et al

Defendant: Michael Davenport, William Williams, Jonathan Wood and Eddie Allen
Plaintiff: Dustin Nelson
Case Number: 5:2013cv00092
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 88 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts' 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; defts' motion is granted re pltf's claims against deft Meinzer; pltf's claims against Meinzer are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; defts' motion is denied in all other respects; Curtis Meinzer terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/21/13. (vjt)
January 6, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 99 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge as to Plaintiff's claims against Wood, William and Allen. As to Plaintiff's claims against Davenport, the Court declines to find him liable for excessive force. Plaintiff&# 039;s claims against Allen, Wood, Williams and Davenport are dismissed with prejudice. His claims against Meinzer are dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would be consider frivilous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/6/2014. (mcz)
May 23, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, pltf's 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/23/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Davenport et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Davenport
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Williams
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Wood
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Allen
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]