Murphy v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Lisa Ryan Murphy
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00117
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/9/13. (kpr)
April 19, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the petitioner to submit either the $5 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed ifp within 30 days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is directed to forward to petitioner an application to proceed ifp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/19/13. (kpr)
May 16, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 30 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Accordingly, judgment shall be entered dismissing this complaint with prejudice. The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability because Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/2014. (ks)
May 16, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the 35 Order entered on this date, it considered, ordered, and adjudged that the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Hobbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ryan Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]