Mosby v. May et al

Defendant: Larry B May, David White, Randall E Manus, Marvin Evans, Jr, Larry B Norris, Jennifer Arledge, Sharon Carter and N Kelly
Plaintiff: Roger D Mosby
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00118
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER adopting 3 Report and Recommendations with clarifications. The 1 Motion to Proceed IFP is denied. The Court will enter Judgment dismissing the complaint without prejudice unless he pays the $350 filing fee by 5/27/2013. The recent 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Ojections is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/15/2013. (dmn)
May 28, 2013 11 Featured Case JUDGMENT: Mosby's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP is denied, and his 2 complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/28/2013. (dmn)
June 20, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER denying 12 Motion for Order; denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 14 Motion to Vacate. Mosby has not received permission to file ifp. His remedy, if any, is to appeal. If Mosby files more motions, the Court will consider a stop-docket order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/13. (kpr)
July 1, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration re 15 Order. The Court willenter a stop-docket order in this case if Mosby, who is a three-striker, filesanything else in this closed case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/1/13. (kpr)
May 1, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Copies; denying 5 Motion for Recusal. The Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a copy of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/1/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mosby v. May et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B May
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall E Manus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B Norris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Arledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D Mosby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]