Doering v. Corizon Medical Services Inc et al

Defendant: Lay, Richard, Corizon Medical Services Inc and Wendy Kelley
Plaintiff: Alan Doering
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00148
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: H. David Young
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 Partial Report and Recommendations; and granting defts Lay and Kelley's 7 Motion to Dismiss to the extent that plaintiff's claims against them for monetary damages in their official capacity is dismissed and denied in all other respects.(kpr)
April 11, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 43 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. 42 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/11/2014. (ks)
April 14, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 36 partial report and recommendation ; denying 29 motion for treatment or separate evaluation of mental health. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/14/2014. (mmd)
October 14, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 57 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting defendants' 48 51 motions for summary judgment; dismissing Plaintiff's 2 complaint with out prejudice with respect to his claims against defendants Corizon Inc., Gaylon Lay and Wendy Kelly and dismissing Plaintiff's 2 complaint with prejudice with respect to his claims against defendant Shaw Richard; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/14/2014. (rhm)
October 14, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 58 Order filed on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed; that the relief sought is denied; and that the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/14/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doering v. Corizon Medical Services Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Doering
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]