Doering v. Moore et al

Defendant: Corizon Medical Services Inc, Esau, Moore and Wendy Kelley
Plaintiff: Alan L Doering
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00149
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations. Deft Corizon, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for defendants Moore and Esau, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on them through the Humphries & Lewis law firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security.The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for defendant Kelley, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint and this Order on her through the ADC Compliance Office, without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/12/13. (kpr)
April 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days, a separate Response to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the issue of exhaustion filed by Wendy Kelley and 33 filed by Annette Esaw, and a separate Statements of Disputed Facts that comply with the Local Rule, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/08/2014. (kcs)
April 9, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file on or before 5/9/2014, a "Motion for Service" that contains a valid service address for Defendant Dr. Moore. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/09/2014. (kcs)
May 29, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff is directed within 30 days to file an Amended Complaint containing the information specified herein. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to timely and properly do so will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/29/2013. (kcs)
April 10, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/10/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doering v. Moore et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan L Doering
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]