Davis v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Nicholas Davis
Defendant: Artis Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00309
Filed: August 15, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Recommendation. Davis's petition is denied as untimely. A certificate of appealability will not issue because Davis hasn't made a substantial showing that the Constitution was violated in his case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2015. (jak)
January 30, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Davis's petition. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2015. (jak)
February 19, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Reconsideration. Davis's belated objections, 14 , do not raise anything new. They're overruled. The Court again adopts the recommended decision but adds one modification. The one year limitations period began on 5 September 2003 and ran before Davis filed his petition. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/19/2015. (jak)
February 19, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT dismissing the petition. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/19/2015. (jak)
March 18, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/18/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artis Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Pamela Rumpz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]