Reed v. Malone's Mechanical, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michael Reed
Defendant: Malone's Mechanical, Inc. and Michael Jacobs
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Malone's Mechanical, Inc. and Michael Jacobs
Thirdparty_defendant: Gilbert Project Services, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02135
Filed: July 22, 2011
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2012 15 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gilbert Project Services, Inc. Further Gilbert's 8 Motion to Dismiss, to the extent that it remains a pending motion, is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 22, 2012. (lw)
July 30, 2012 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File, denying as moot 35 Motion to Amend/Correct, denying 36 Motion for Reconsideration and further denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by Malone's Mechanical, Inc. and Michael Jacobs. This case remains set for jury trial beginning 8/20/12. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 30, 2012. (lw)
August 24, 2012 63 Featured Case JUDGMENT that Plaintiff takes nothing on his Complaint and the matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All parties are to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 24, 2012. (lw)
December 14, 2012 69 Featured Case ORDER denying 64 Motion for New Trial, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 14, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reed v. Malone's Mechanical, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reed
Represented By: Sam Sexton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malone's Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jacobs
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Malone's Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Michael Jacobs
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Gilbert Project Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Leslie Evitts, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]