Robert Griffin, et al v. U.S. Trustee

Appellant: Robert Griffin and Julia Griffin
Appellee: Arvest Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02084
Filed: April 17, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER as set forth. ( Appellee Brief due by 7/2/2012.) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 18, 2012. (lw)
July 27, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER appointing Richard L. Cox, Chapter 11 Trustee. Signed by Honorable Ben Barry, United States Bankruptcy Judge on July 17, 2012. (Bankruptcy Court Case number 2:10-bk-73471, Doc #370) (jrs)
September 21, 2012 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER affirming the decision of the Bankruptcy Court and dismissing the Appeal cc: Bankruptcy Clerk and Judge. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 21, 2012. (rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robert Griffin, et al v. U.S. Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert Griffin
Represented By: Derrick Mark Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julia Griffin
Represented By: Derrick Mark Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arvest Bank
Represented By: Craig A Campbell
Represented By: Jackie L. Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Ruston C. Welch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]