Plantation, LLC, The v. U.S. Trustee

Appellant: Plantation, LLC, The
Appellee: Arvest Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02088
Filed: April 17, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER, as set forth. ( Appellee Brief due by 7/2/2012.) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 18, 2012. (lw)
July 27, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER appointing John T. Lee, Chapter 11 Trustee. Signed by Honorable Ben Barry, United States District Judge on July 18, 2012. (Bankruptcy Court Case number 2:10-bk-74742, Doc #318). (jrs)
September 21, 2012 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER affirming the judgment of the bankruptcy court and the appeal is dismissed. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 21, 2012. Copies to Bankruptcy Clerk & Judge(msj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Plantation, LLC, The v. U.S. Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Plantation, LLC, The
Represented By: Derrick Mark Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arvest Bank
Represented By: Craig A Campbell
Represented By: Jackie L. Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Ruston C. Welch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]