Pinson et al v. 45 Development, LLC et al

Thirdparty_plaintiff: Citi Trends, Inc.
Defendant: John Alford, Citi Trends, Inc., Cititrends Development Company, LLC, Cititrends Growth Company, LLC, John Does 1-5, 45 Development, LLC and Jeff Palmer
Thirdparty_defendant: Brandrite Sign Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Curtis Pinson and Cristi Pinson
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02160
Filed: July 19, 2012
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 101 Motion to Compel. Citi Trends is ordered to appropriately respond to Brandrite's discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on July 22, 2013. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 8, 2013. (jas) Modified text on 7/8/2013 (jas).
July 9, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery until August 14, 2013. Deadline for motions are extended to August 22, 2013. All other provisions and deadlines of the Final Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 9, 2013. (sh)
July 22, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 118 directing that Citi Trends pay to Brandrite $117.00 in attorneys' fees incurred in making Brandrite's motion to compel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 22, 2013. (sh)
July 29, 2013 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 113 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; DENYING relief requested in Plaintiffs' Supplement to Motion 142 ; and DENYING AS MOOT 143 Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel for failure to comply with federal and local rules. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 29, 2013. (jas)
August 23, 2013 235 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Motions DENIED as set out in the opinion and order. Refer to order regarding refiling motions per court requirements no later than Wednesday, August 28, 2013 and response deadlines thereto. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 23, 2013. (jas)
August 27, 2013 236 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene 171 is DENIED. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 27, 2013. (jas)
August 28, 2013 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of Plaintiffs' attorneys' fees and expenses. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 28, 2013. (jas)
September 23, 2013 275 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Judgment will be entered contemporaneously with this order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 23, 2013. (jas)
September 23, 2013 276 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 23, 2013. ***Civil Case Terminated.(jas)
September 21, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Plaintiffs Motion for Discovery; denying 37 Motion for Pretrial Conference and denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 21, 2012. (sh)
September 24, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without prejudice re 40 and 41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by plaintiffs, as to separate defendants, Cititrends Development Company, LLC and Cititrends Growth Company, LLC., only. Signed on this September 24, 2012.(sh) Modified to add text on 9/24/2012 (sh).
September 27, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 44 Notice of dismissal as to separate defendants John Does No. 1 thru 5. (sh)
July 23, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before Monday July 30, 2012. If plaintiffs fail to properly and timely file an Amended Complaint the court will dismiss this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction re 1 Complaint. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 23, 2012. (sh)
February 5, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 , Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Separate Defendants, John Alford and Jeff Palmer, and they are terminated from this action. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 5, 2013. (sh)
May 28, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion in Limine; denying 73 Motion in Limine; denying 80 Motion in Limine; denying 86 Motion in Limine; and denying as moot 77 Motion to Amend/Correct. Refer to the Order for further instructions from the Court. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 28, 2013. (jas) Modified text on 5/28/2013 (jas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pinson et al v. 45 Development, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Citi Trends, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Howard Bacon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Alford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Trends, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Howard Bacon
Represented By: Donald Howard Bacon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cititrends Development Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cititrends Growth Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 Development, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Brandrite Sign Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Pinson
Represented By: Raymond Lee Niblock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristi Pinson
Represented By: Raymond Lee Niblock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]