Southeast X-Ray, Inc. et al v. Spears et al

Plaintiff: Southeast X-Ray, Inc. and Real Radiology, LLC
Defendant: Rapid Radiology, Inc., Michael Spears and Kenneth Dean Vaughan
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02026
Filed: January 25, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 14 Featured Case NOTICE, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 31, 2013. (lw)
March 8, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 8, 2013. (lw)
October 8, 2013 32 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 8, 2013. (Attachments: Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement)(jas)
November 8, 2013 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, as set forth. Further, Plaintiff Southeast X-Ray, Inc, is dismissed as a party from this lawsuit. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 8, 2013. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Southeast X-Ray, Inc. et al v. Spears et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast X-Ray, Inc.
Represented By: Peter G. Kumpe
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Radiology, LLC
Represented By: Peter G. Kumpe
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Philip E. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid Radiology, Inc.
Represented By: Mark M. Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Spears
Represented By: Andrew R. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Dean Vaughan
Represented By: Andrew R. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]