Stebbins v. Stebbins et al

Plaintiff: David A. Stebbins
Defendant: Rita F. Stebbins and David D. Stebbins
Case Number: 3:2012cv03130
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 7 with modifications; denying 9 Motion to Disqualify Judge, and denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Civil Case Dismissed WITH prejudice; FURTHER plaintiff is limited to filing one case in the federal courts for the Western District of Arkansas, per every three calendar months AS SET FORTH; FURTHER Plaintiff is enjoined from filing any lawsuits in federal court in this District, the Western District of Arkansas unless he posts a $100.00 refundable bond with the clerk of court AS SET FORTH. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 3, 2013. (sh) Modified to add text on 7/3/2013 (sh).
July 25, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 25, 2013. (lw)
November 26, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 20 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 26, 2013. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stebbins v. Stebbins et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Stebbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita F. Stebbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D. Stebbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]