St. Jude Medical, Inc. et al v. Access Closure, Inc.

Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical, Inc. and St. Jude Medical Puerto Rico LLC
Defendant: Access Closure, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv04101
Filed: October 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER with respect to the '616, '602, '375, '498 and '439 patents. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 19, 2010. (cap)
November 23, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 158 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Dismiss filed by Access Closure, Inc.; denying 160 Motion to Bifurcate Standing filed by Access Closure, Inc. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 23, 2010. (cap)
December 1, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 1, 2010. (cap)
December 1, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Summary Judgment; ACI's allegations of inequitable conduct in the prosecution of the Fowler patents are hereby dismissed; denying 146 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 1, 2010. (cap)
May 1, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on May 1, 2009. (cap)
July 26, 2011 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 295 STIPULATION REGARDING ADMISSION OF JURY TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by St. Jude Medical Puerto Rico LLC (A Puerto Rico Limited Liability Company), St. Jude Medical, Inc.(a Minnesota Corporation), Access Closure, Inc. as set forth. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 26, 2011. (Joint Trial Exhibit List attached.) (mfr)
November 8, 2011 307 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 8, 2011. (cap)
January 23, 2012 308 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on claims for patent infringement. Issues remain for an accounting, and the Court will receive any motions for such awards in connection with the accounting after ACI's anticipated interlocutory appeal. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on January 23, 2012. (cap)
June 4, 2012 360 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - PERMANENT INJUNCTION. This permanent injunction shall run until the expiration of U.S. Patent No. 7,008,439, currently March 7, 2023. This Court retains jurisdiction to enforce any and all aspects of this Permanent Injunction. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on June 4, 2012. (cap)
December 18, 2012 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 380 Motion to Approve Appeal Bond and Stay Execution of the Monetary Judgment. Defendant shall file within 10 days of this Order's entry its motion to approve its revised bond clarifying the third clause. T he bond amount is sufficient. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to approve is due 7 days after Defendant's motion is filed. The response shall address only the nullification-clause issue. No reply will be considered. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 18, 2012. (cap)
September 30, 2014 402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 30, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Jude Medical, Inc. et al v. Access Closure, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas H. Patton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical Puerto Rico LLC
Represented By: Nicholas H. Patton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Closure, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]